Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Saint-Estève

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹BornNavarre
24 Feb 168035.1SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
15 Jul 168035.5ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
Aug 1680³35.5Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
24 Dec 170762.9DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Saint-Estève:
Bishop Gabriel de Saint-Estève (born 1645, died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015