Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Melchior Söllner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1601Born
28 Mar 162624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
7 Dec 164847.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
7 Dec 164847.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
6 Jun 164947.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
16 May 166664.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Melchior Söllner
Bishop Johann Melchior Söllner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeustadt/Saale

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 176
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018