Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Singlau

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1801Born
18 Dec 182423.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 184947.5AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
16 Sep 184947.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
18 Jan 186765.2DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Singlau
Bishop Giuseppe Singlau (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pisa, Archdiocese of Pisa

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1849, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018