Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberico Simonetta

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1694Born
12 Apr 172732.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173541.1AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
9 Oct 173541.1Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
11 Mar 173944.5DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberico Simonetta
Bishop Alberico Simonetta (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 11.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,735, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast