Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Sersale

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1708Born
29 Jun 173122.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 175849.6AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
19 Mar 175849.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
10 Jan 175950.4DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sersale
Archbishop Giuseppe Sersale (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorrento

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1759
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast