Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Serbelloni

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1695BornMilano, Italy
29 Jun 173135.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jul 173135.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 173135.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
12 Dec 173136.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
18 Mar 173539.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
31 Mar 173539.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
28 Jul 173842.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
30 Sep 173842.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
5 Mar 174650.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
15 Apr 174650.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
26 Nov 175358.0Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jun 175458.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
22 Jul 175458.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
21 Mar 176367.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
16 May 176367.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
18 Apr 177478.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
7 Dec 177580.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Serbelloni (VIAF: 171885508)
Fabrizio Cardinal Serbelloni (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a cardinal for 22.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 37
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016