Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Severoli

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
3 Apr 163437.2AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
17 Apr 1634³37.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
3 Oct 163942.7ResignedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
3 Oct 163942.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
1666¹69.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Severoli
Archbishop Antonio Severoli (born 1597, died 1666) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Montorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 291, and Page 254
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017