Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cherubin Scali, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1763BornRoma, Italy
17 Dec 178522.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 182360.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
6 Apr 182360.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
14 Nov 184683.8DiedTitular Bishop of Dionysias

MicroData Summary for Cherubin Scali:
Bishop Cherubin Scali O.F.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Dionysias

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013