Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Scala

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornSerra Sant’Abondio
12 Jan 163756.0AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
25 Jan 163756.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
18 May 164362.3AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
19 Jan 166786.0DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Scala:
Bishop Bernardino Scala (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369, and Page 186
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 98, Number 590
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1637, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015