Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Maria de Santini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nebbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1729BornBastia
18 Sep 175122.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 177545.4SelectedBishop of Nebbio, France
15 Jul 177646.8ConfirmedBishop of Nebbio, France
8 Sep 177647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
Oct 1801²72.0ResignedBishop of Nebbio, France
5 Dec 181485.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nebbio, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique Maria de Santini:
Bishop Dominique Maria de Santini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nebbio

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 305
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,920
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015