Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Stefano Sanarica (Senarega), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1637Born
29 Jun 166022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Feb 167133.5AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
8 Mar 167133.6Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
16 Jun 167941.8DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Stefano Sanarica (Senarega)
Bishop Giovanni Stefano Sanarica (Senarega) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbaro

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast