Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Andrea Sambiase, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1713BornLecce
1729¹15.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Mar 173724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Feb 176754.1AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
24 Feb 176754.1Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
16 Dec 177663.9AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
26 May 179986.3DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Andrea Sambiase:
Archbishop Ignazio Andrea Sambiase C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 91, and Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 10 Dec 2015