Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Marie Ruffo de Laric

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1746BornGrenoble
29 Aug 177932.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
13 Dec 177933.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
23 Jan 178033.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
1801²54.1ResignedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
1 Oct 181669.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Marie Ruffo de Laric:
Bishop Claude-Marie Ruffo de Laric (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour

  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015