Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Michele Rossi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1633AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
16 Jan 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
11 Apr 1633AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
25 Dec 1638³DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Michele Rossi
Bishop Giovanni Michele Rossi O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Transpontina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 78
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,633, Number 3
  • ob/c2: AT, 7 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,999

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast