Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maria Rosini

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1748³BornNapoli
4 Apr 177223.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179749.5SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
18 Dec 179749.6ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
21 Dec 179749.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
18 Feb 183687.8DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Rosini
Bishop Carlo Maria Rosini (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016