Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Hartmann von Rosenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1609BornStammheim
13 Mar 167363.4SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
10 Sep 167464.9ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
6 Jan 167565.3Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
19 Apr 167565.5DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Hartmann von Rosenbach:
Bishop Johann Hartmann von Rosenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015