Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Rosa

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1635Born
11 Jan 169054.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
22 Jan 169054.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Nov 1694³58.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rosa
Archbishop Giuseppe Rosa (born , died Nov 1694) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca Bernarda, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,111
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018