Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Vincenzo Rovero, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1655AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
31 Oct 1655Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
25 Oct 1665DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Vincenzo Rovero
Bishop Paolo Vincenzo Rovero B. (died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 98
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,655, Number 45
  • ln/ob/c2: AT, 3 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast