Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Rocco

Deceased

Bishop of Capri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1693³BornSorrente
22 Dec 171522.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 171623.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 175157.6AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
23 May 175157.6Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
1776¹82.3DiedBishop of Capri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Rocco:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Rocco (born , died 1776) Bishop of Capri

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015