Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Rocca

Deceased

Bishop of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1765BornCercemaggiore
6 Jun 178924.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 182964.0SelectedBishop of Larino, Italy
21 May 182964.3ConfirmedBishop of Larino, Italy
26 May 182964.3Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
29 May 184580.3DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Rocca (VIAF: 89145434)
Bishop Vincenzo Rocca (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jul 2016