Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Rini (Rhini), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornPalermo
1 Oct 167450.7AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
7 Oct 167450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
19 Oct 167652.7AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
4 Aug 169672.5DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Rini (Rhini):
Bishop Francesco Maria Rini (Rhini) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1674, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015