Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georgius Richvaldszky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Tanagra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1720BornBartfa
30 May 174424.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177656.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
16 Dec 177656.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
7 Aug 177959.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Georgius Richvaldszky:
Bishop Georgius Richvaldszky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 35.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013