Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Ricciardi

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornFermo
1 Sep 168160.6AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
14 Sep 168160.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
1683¹62.0DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Ricciardi:
Bishop Stefano Ricciardi (born 1621, died 1683) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015