Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Resino (Rezino) y Ormachea

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1645³BornLa Habana
14 Dec 170560.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba
14 Dec 170560.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
2 May 170761.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
12 Sep 171165.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Resino (Rezino) y Ormachea:
Bishop Dionisio Resino (Rezino) y Ormachea (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013