Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Rendina

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1660Born
22 Oct 168424.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 170847.6AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
20 May 170847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
15 Nov 171656.2DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Rendina
Bishop Angelo Rendina (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSan Crisogono, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 18
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast