Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Maria Cardinal Ranuzzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1626BornBologna
30 Apr 166841.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
5 Jun 166842.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
24 Jun 166842.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
5 May 167144.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 Jun 167145.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
Aug 1673³47.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
18 Apr 167851.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fano, Italy
2 Sep 168660.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 168861.9AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Sep 168963.3DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Ranuzzi (VIAF: 29381362)
Angelo Maria Cardinal Ranuzzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • c34: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 23
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016