Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Peter Przichowsky von Przichowitz

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1707³BornSvojsin
29 Apr 173123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
24 Feb 175244.4SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
25 Sep 175245.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
25 Sep 175245.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
19 Nov 175245.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
29 Sep 175346.0SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
14 Jan 175446.3ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
26 Oct 176356.1SucceededArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
26 Oct 176356.1ResignedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
13 May 176456.7InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 Apr 179385.6DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Peter Przichowsky von Przichowitz:
Archbishop Anton Peter Przichowsky von Przichowitz (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208, and Page 348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 355
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016