Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavel Josef Seddeler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1735³Born
5 Mar 175722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Dec 175722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
11 Sep 177540.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
11 Sep 177540.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
12 Nov 177540.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
4 Sep 177641.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pavel Josef Seddeler
Bishop Pavel Josef Seddeler (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018