Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Andreas Kaiser

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1716³BornWegstädtl
22 Feb 173922.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 Dec 173923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
3 Mar 176043.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
3 Mar 176043.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
13 Apr 176043.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
14 May 177558.4SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
17 Jul 177558.6ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
15 Oct 177558.8InstalledBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
5 May 177659.4DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Andreas Kaiser:
Bishop Johann Andreas Kaiser (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 355, and Page 401
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015