Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zdenko Georg Chrzepíczky von Modliskovic

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Mennith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1678³Born
19 Feb 170122.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
12 Mar 170122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Sep 174365.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Sep 174365.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
16 May 175577.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zdenko Georg Chrzepíczky von Modliskovic
Bishop Zdenko Georg Chrzepíczky von Modliskovic (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSedlec

  • a priest for 54.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018