Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Visconte Proto, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1781BornMilazzo
1802¹20.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Feb 180524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Feb 183958.0AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
Apr 1839³58.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
20 May 184463.3SelectedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
17 Jun 184463.3ConfirmedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
13 Oct 185473.7DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Visconte Proto:
Bishop Giovanni Maria Visconte Proto O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalý

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 146, and Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013