Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan del Pozo Horta, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1584Born
16 Jul 164661.5AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
14 Oct 164661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
10 Jan 165065.0AppointedBishop of León, Spain
1 Apr 165671.3SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
28 Aug 165671.7ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
16 Aug 166075.6DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan del Pozo Horta
Bishop Juan del Pozo Horta O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 310
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,574
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 176, Number 1,093
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast