Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Pollicini

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1603BornBologna
10 Nov 165350.3AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
16 Nov 165350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
7 Jul 165652.9DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Pollicini:
Bishop Lorenzo Pollicini (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 116, Number 708
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013