Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Poderico

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornNapoli
Feb 1647³46.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 164746.4AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
2 Jun 164746.4Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
1650¹49.0DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Poderico
Bishop Ottavio Poderico (born 1601, died 1650) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

  • a priest for 2.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 352
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 22
  • ob/c2: AT, 4 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016