Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Piscina

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618²Born
14 Jan 166446.0AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
27 Jan 166446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
9 Jan 166850.0DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Piscina
Bishop Carlo Piscina (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Saluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 3
  • b/c2: AT, 4 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018