Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Piccinardi (Picenardi)

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1661Born
14 Mar 170139.5AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
3 Apr 170139.6Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
Dec 1722³61.2DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Piccinardi (Picenardi)
Bishop Ottavio Piccinardi (Picenardi) (born , died Dec 1722) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona

  • a bishop for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: CB, 13 May 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,684
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018