Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Piccardi

Deceased

Bishop of Sora, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹Born
21 Sep 165637.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 166041.0AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
25 Jan 166041.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
10 Mar 167556.1DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Piccardi
Bishop Maurizio Piccardi (born 1619, died ) Bishop of Sora

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontecorvo
Ordained BishopSant'Agostino, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 360
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 38
  • ob/c2: AT, 15 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast