Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Piacentini, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ispahan, Iran

Note/Previous Titular See: (Sebastianus a S. Margherita)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1713Born
19 Oct 173219.1ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Mar 175137.5AppointedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
16 Apr 175238.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan, Iran
22 Jun 175541.8DiedBishop of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Piacentini
Bishop Marco Antonio Piacentini O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Sebastiani, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast