Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Pescherard, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad

Titular Bishop of Berytus

Titular See: (Timothée de La Fléche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹BornLa Fléche
29 May 171551.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq
29 May 171551.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
2 Jun 171551.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berytus
29 Aug 171854.6ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq
11 Jun 174480.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jacques Pescherard:
Bishop Jacques Pescherard O.F.M. Cap. (born 1664, died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 110, and Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015