Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Pawłowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Niochensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1698³BornLwowek
23 Apr 172223.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jun 172223.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 174849.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Jul 174849.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Niochensis
22 Sep 174850.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Niochensis
175960.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Pawłowski:
Bishop Józef Pawłowski (born , died 1759) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,455
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015