Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Pasini

Deceased

Bishop of Todi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1720BornRimini
18 Sep 174525.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 174525.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 176039.9AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
25 Jul 176039.9Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
24 Dec 177353.3DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Pasini:
Bishop Francesco Maria Pasini (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015