Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Parisi

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1632SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
24 Nov 1632ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
30 Nov 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
24 Jan 1649DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Parisi:
Bishop Marco Antonio Parisi (died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,894
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 354
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015