Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Parcevich

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
6 Mar 165648.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia
6 Mar 165648.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcianopolis
25 Mar 165648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcianopolis
23 Jul 167466.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Parcevich
Bishop Pierre Parcevich (born 1608, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiprovatz
Ordained BishopSt. Silvestre in capite, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast