Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Panicola

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
15 Dec 164261.9AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
1 Jan 164362.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
10 Nov 166685.8DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Bernardino Panicola
Bishop Bernardino Panicola
(born 1581, died )
Bishop of Ravello e Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonticelli

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 292
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 108, Number 656
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025