Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Paolucci Mancinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1758BornTodi
21 Dec 178224.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 180143.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
4 Oct 180143.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
11 Jan 180849.4AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
Oct 1815³57.2DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Paolucci Mancinelli:
Bishop Francesco Maria Paolucci Mancinelli (born ) Bishop of Fano

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 191, and Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013