Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Cesare Pallavicini

Deceased

Bishop of Luni e Sarzana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1741³BornBastia
2 Jun 175918.4ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Aug 177029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Sep 180463.7AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
30 Sep 180463.7Ordained BishopBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
13 May 181978.4DiedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Pallavicini:
Bishop Giulio Cesare Pallavicini (born , died ) Bishop of Luni e Sarzana

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013