Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Ortolani

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1839Born
21 May 186424.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 187738.0AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
4 Nov 187738.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
6 May 191070.6DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Ortolani (VIAF: 89640383)
Bishop Bartolomeo Ortolani (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna
Ordained BishopAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 69
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast