Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Girolamo Orengo, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1734Born
26 Nov 175824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
24 Sep 180469.9AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
30 Sep 180470.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
30 May 181277.6DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Girolamo Orengo
Bishop Paolo Girolamo Orengo Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVentimiglia, Diocese of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 21
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast