Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Olantes, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1649BornRagusa
31 May 168838.7AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
8 Jun 168838.7Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
10 Nov 169243.2DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Carlo Olantes:
Bishop Carlo Olantes O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,237
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015