Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale de Nicolais

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1776BornCervinara
21 Sep 179923.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 182043.5SelectedBishop of Nusco, Italy
21 Feb 182043.5ConfirmedBishop of Nusco, Italy
27 Feb 182043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
15 May 183558.8DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale de Nicolais
Bishop Pasquale de Nicolais (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1820, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016